Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 07:32:43 (UTC).

E&S RING MANAGEMENT CORP. VS. DICKINSON, JARED

Case Summary

On 11/23/2004 E S RING MANAGEMENT CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DICKINSON, JARED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3609

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E&S RING MANAGEMENT CORP.

Defendants

DICKINSON JARED

THAO NUE XIONG

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - SHERYL MANDELBAUM ESQ

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2004
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL . RECEIPT # CUL474108013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 58.83 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/14/04 . FOR (E&S RING MANAGEMENT CORP.) . AGAINST (DICKINSON, JARED) , (THAO, NUE XIONG) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 14108 TAHITI WAY #615, MARINA DEL REY, CA 90292 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DICKINSON, JARED) , (THAO, NUE XIONG) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) ON 12/13/04 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/23/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E&S RING MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELBAUM, SHERYL