This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2016 at 18:06:02 (UTC).

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES VS. REDDING, SARAH L.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2004 EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REDDING, SARAH L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0385

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT

Defendants

REDDING SARAH L.

MARSH SAM C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2005
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2005
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/21/05 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (REDDING, SARAH L.) , (MARSH, SAM C.) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS. SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (REDDING, SARAH L.) , (MARSH, SAM C.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/02/04 , FOR (EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT) , AGAINST (REDDING, SARAH L.) , (MARSH, SAM C.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 25399 N. THE OLD RD. #11-306, STEVENSON RNH, CA 91381 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 45.30 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW467864004 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW285283022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 07/09/04 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 004 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ