Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2016 at 03:33:37 (UTC).

E INVESTIGATIONS, INC. VS. ALL PHASE DEVELOPMENT, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2001 E INVESTIGATIONS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL PHASE DEVELOPMENT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2325

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E INVESTIGATIONS INC.

Defendant

ALL PHASE DEVELOPMENT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 , HON. MINA FRIED, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 040901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/09/01 . FOR P001 . AGAINST D001 . PRINCIPAL $ 1600.00 . COSTS $ 27.00 . TOTAL $ 1627.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO D001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2001
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ALL PHASE DEVELOPMENT, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV407191007 . HEARING SET FOR 04/09/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Phase Development Inc is a litigant