This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 04:39:10 (UTC).

DSL CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION VS. EHRHARDT, PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 03/16/2004 DSL CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EHRHARDT, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0299

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DSL CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Defendant

EHRHARDT PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLOYD, HARRY E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2004
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2004
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2004
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketDEFAULT PACKAGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2004
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2004
  • DocketORDER TO POST SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2004
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST RECEIVED; $36.30/LAW494391021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2004
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2004
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D.S.L. CONSTRUCTION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELLER & FLOYD - HARRY E. FLOYD ESQ