Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 05:29:17 (UTC).

D&S GARMENT SUPPLIES INC VS. GNS FASHION INC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2004 D S GARMENT SUPPLIES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GNS FASHION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1792

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D&S GARMENT SUPPLIES INC

Defendant

GNS FASHION INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (GNS FASHION INC) BY SUB-SERVING JESSIE JEON . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/27/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2004
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC462320008. HEARING SET FOR 08/27/04 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GNS FASHION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA GLAM is a litigant