This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2016 at 08:03:54 (UTC).

DOWELL, JACKIE R. VS. QUINTERO, VS. LETICIA

Case Summary

On 06/17/2003 DOWELL, JACKIE R filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against QUINTERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH AMADO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1202

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH AMADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOWELL JACKIE R.

Defendant

QUINTERO LETICIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2005
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/09/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2003
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2003
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2003
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2003
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (QUINTERO, LETICIA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/15/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketMATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/15/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2003
  • DocketMATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 10/15/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • DocketMATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/08/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DOWELL, JACKIE R.) IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW. PAYMENT OF ALL THE FEES AND COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985{I}, CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2003
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 985(I)CRC . HEARING SET FOR 07/28/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DOWELL, JACKIE R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2003
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (DOWELL, JACKIE R.) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less