Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 06:46:12 (UTC).

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC. VS. GOLDSMITH, DAVID

Case Summary

On 02/13/2002 DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOLDSMITH, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0063

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC.

Defendants

GOLDSMITH MARY KAY

GOLDSMITH DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL, WITHEM, ZEFF & NAHMI - MICHAEL D. ZEFF ESQ

Attorney at ROSENTHAL, WITHEM, ZEFF & NAHMI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF JOHN BOUZANE (MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT: INCORRECT CASE NUMBER 02U00063 DISMISSED ON 03/14/02. SUBMITTED ON 03/25/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR. PURSUANT TO TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF. DISMISSAL TO BE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 04/19/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF JOHN BOUZANE (MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT/MEMO TO SER: INCORRECT CASE NUMBER. I BELIEVE THE CORRECT CASE NUMBER IS 02U00068. SUBMITTED ON 03/07/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 03/12/02 AT 01:30P M., IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GOLDSMITH, DAVID) . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GOLDSMITH, MARY KAY) . COSTS OF $ 28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS $28.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GOLDSMITH, DAVID) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GOLDSMITH, MARY KAY) . RECEIPT # SNI439479004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/27/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.