This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:25:46 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS. KAY, MORIS

Case Summary

On 11/07/2012 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KAY, MORIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1337

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK FKA GREENWOOD TRUST COMPANY

Defendant

KAY MORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC - HARVEY M. MOORE

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (KAY, MORIS) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 12/28/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 01/28/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 02C01337 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 18043.77 . RECEIPT # 451225040 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 8998.21 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 11/07/12 , FOR (DISCOVER BANK) FKA (GREENWOOD TRUST COMPANY) , AGAINST (KAY, MORIS) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 9015.56 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 8998.21 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 18,043.77 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 11/07/12 W/SAME CASE #02C01337 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED 11/16/2002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (DISCOVER BANK) FKA (GREENWOOD TRUST COMPANY) , RECEIPT NO. 246938021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2862.73 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # 278865020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO ALL DOE DEFENDANTS ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KAY, MORIS) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • ORDER VACATING STAY OF EXECUTION SIGNED AND FILED. ORDER ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: ANGELA C. DAWSON IN SUPPORT OF ENTY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2002
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (KAY, MORIS) ON 11/14/02 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 139.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KAY, MORIS) BY LEAVING COPY W/JASMIN KAY . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2002
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/02 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. WBH . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/01/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # 278865007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less