Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2016 at 13:35:18 (UTC).

DIAL, DIANA VS. GUERRO, CHUCK

Case Summary

On 05/24/2002 DIAL, DIANA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUERRO, CHUCK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LINDA THORNTON and MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0470

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LINDA THORNTON

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAL DIANA

Defendant

GUERRO CHUCK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2002
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2002
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2002
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 1520-1707 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. LINDA THORNTON, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION BY PARTIES, THE COURT ORDERS THE MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/26/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2002
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 53.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # SNI439479003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2002
  • 'NSF' CHECK RECEIVED RE: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT , (DIAL, DIANA) NOTIFIED BY MAIL PER SECTION C.C.P. 411.20. PAYMENT DUE BY 08/20/02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO BOOKKEEPER'S OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PARTIES INFORM THE COURT THAT A SETTLEMENT IS REACHED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/12/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . IF NO APPEARANCE MATTER WILL BE DISMISSED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (GUERRO, CHUCK) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/24/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SNI439479011. HEARING SET FOR 06/24/02 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less