This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 16:18:34 (UTC).

DEL ROSARIO, GLORIA VS. DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 DEL ROSARIO, GLORIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALBERT D. MATTHEWS and JOHN W. BUNNETT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0431

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALBERT D. MATTHEWS

JOHN W. BUNNETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL ROSARIO GLORIA

Defendant

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2001
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED 112801 . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. ALBERT D. MATTHEWS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING X . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/06/01 . FOR (DEL ROSARIO, GLORIA) . AGAINST (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 5050.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 09/06/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 . RECEIPT # 00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. ALBERT D. MATTHEWS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S BANKRUPTCY; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT HAS RECEIVED A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY FROM THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT. THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR A SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SET FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2001 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DIVISION 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2001
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND VACATING THE DISCHARGE OF BANKRUPTCY IF PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 08/13/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. JOHN W. BUNNETT, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING X . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. MATTER ORDERED OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/16/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # PAID . HEARING SET FOR 04/16/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.