Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2016 at 16:01:30 (UTC).

DEJARDIN ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. TELLEZ, DINA

Case Summary

On 08/28/2002 DEJARDIN ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TELLEZ, DINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE WILSON and MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0844

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE WILSON

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEJARDIN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA FAST CASH

Defendant

TELLEZ DINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY CHRISTOPH HOPPE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT NOT SERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CHRISTOPH HOPPE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/16/03 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CHRISTOPH HOPPE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2002
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/12/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. ELAINE WILSON, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY CHRISTOPH HOPPE, (PRESIDENT) . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . MOTION MADE BY PLAINTIFF TO RESET THE HEARING. MOTION GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 11/07/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # SNI478057004 . HEARING SET FOR 10/03/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2002
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DAMAGES FOR DISHONORED CHECK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEJARDIN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA FAST CASH is a litigant