This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 06:01:51 (UTC).

DE LA TORRE,PATRICK VS. WHEELER,KRISTI

Case Summary

On 03/23/2005 DE LA TORRE,PATRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHEELER,KRISTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0924

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA TORRE PATRICK

Defendant

WHEELER KRISTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/14/05 . FOR (DE LA TORRE,PATRICK) . AGAINST (WHEELER,KRISTI) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3932 STEVELY AVENUE #5, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 33.17 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. WES . FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (DE LA TORRE,PATRICK) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL SUBMITTED ON 04/07/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2005
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (WHEELER,KRISTI) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 481447003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/22/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEQ . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less