Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 09:28:16 (UTC).

DE LA TORRE, PATRICK VS. NORWOOD, CLARK

Case Summary

On 03/17/2004 DE LA TORRE, PATRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NORWOOD, CLARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0814

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA TORRE PATRICK

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

NORWOOD CLARK JR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL462301010 . MAILED TO ATTY OFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (NORWOOD, CLARK) JR. . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/26/04 . FOR (DE LA TORRE, PATRICK) . AGAINST (NORWOOD, CLARK) JR. . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 4633 AUGUST STREET #17, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 7.53 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL481447008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/16/04 AT 09:15A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, ALLEN R.