Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 07:08:07 (UTC).

DE LA TORRE, PATRICK VS. HATCHER, EMECA O.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2004 DE LA TORRE, PATRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HATCHER, EMECA O. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3357

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE LA TORRE PATRICK

Defendant

HATCHER EMECA O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ALLEN R. KING

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RETURNED VIA U.S. MAIL NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 01-17-05 . RECEIPT # CUL474108014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 19.13 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY G. HOFFMAN, ESQ . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/01/04 . FOR (DE LA TORRE, PATRICK) . AGAINST (HATCHER, EMECA O.) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 4525 AUGUST #17, LOS ANGELES, CA 90008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 12/01/04 AT 08:30A M., IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2004
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (HATCHER, EMECA O.) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (HATCHER, EMECA O.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (HATCHER, EMECA O.) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FILING PAPERS, CERTIFICATION & COPYING AND SHERIFF AND MARSHAL FEES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (HATCHER, EMECA O.) . RECEIPT # F/W .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL462301006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/06/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING, ALLEN R.