Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2016 at 06:44:00 (UTC).

DANIELS, MARION VS. AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2004 DANIELS, MARION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICORP FUNDING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH AMADO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0597

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH AMADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIELS MARION

Defendants

GANT FRANKLOAN REPRESENTATIVE

AMERICORP FUNDING INC.AKALOANGOD. COM DAVID JALALI PRESIDENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BY: DAVID JALALI . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO COMMISSIONER AMADO RE: LETTER FROM DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE FILE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING SMALL CLAIMS TO 08/03/04 AT 01:30P , IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2004
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. RALPH AMADO COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2004
  • REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT RECEIVED AND FILED BY (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT . RECEIPT # CUL419437012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT FOR REJECTION OF POSTPONEMENT. PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH $10.00 FEE SUBMITTED ON 05/14/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 06/21/04 AT 01:30P M. IN DIV. 003 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2004
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (AMERICORP FUNDING, INC.)AKA(LOANGOD. COM) DAVID JALALI, PRESIDENT . RECEIPT # CUL404216001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2004
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2004
  • MISC. DOCUMENTS RECEIVED FROM DEFENDANT RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # CUL404216008 . HEARING SET FOR 06/21/04 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003

    Read MoreRead Less