This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 05:28:44 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT VS. GABRIEL, RONALD

Case Summary

On 09/09/2004 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GABRIEL, RONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2723

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

GABRIEL RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O. BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O. BARNES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/31/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DIV. WEQ . SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE, 1725 MAIN STREET, SANTA MONICA, CA 90401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • COURTHOUSE CLOSURE/CASE TRANSFER/RESCHEDULE NOTICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT) FOR REJECTION OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT. YOU MUST SUBMIT A 585 DECLARATION WHICH SHOWS THAT THE DEFENDANT IS LIABLE ON THIS ACCOUNT. ALL THAT YOU HAVE ATTACHED TO YOUR DECLARATIONS IS A LIST OF YOUR OUTSTANDING DEBTORS. DO YOU HAVE ANY EVIDENCE WHICH SUBMITTED ON 01/27/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 THROUGH 10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2004
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GABRIEL, RONALD) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOSEPH S. BIDERMAN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL: . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR DUE TO A PROOF OF SERVICE HAVING BEEN FILED. THE PREVIOUSLY SET NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 2-8-05 STANDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (GABRIEL, RONALD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 12/08/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/08/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 09/09/04

    Read MoreRead Less