This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 08:04:40 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, VS. PARAMOUNT SIGNATURE SETTLEMENT

Case Summary

On 01/23/2004 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PARAMOUNT SIGNATURE SETTLEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0224

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

PARAMOUNT SIGNATURE SETTLEMENTS LLC DBAPSS TITLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNETH J. FREED ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/31/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2004
  • NOTICE RE: SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2004
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU,)INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PARAMOUNT SIGNATURE SETTLEMENTS,)LLC DBA(PSS TITLE) . COSTS OF $ 5.57 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN 485132007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/30/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/23/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2004
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED OSC RE: COMPLIANCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY