This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 11:27:20 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU IN VS. SOUTH BAY PROPANE SERVICE INC.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2005 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU IN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SOUTH BAY PROPANE SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN H. REID. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN H. REID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

RAMSOUER ROBIN S.

SOUTH BAY PROPANE SERVICE INC.

MARINA PROPANE SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - KENNETH J. FREED ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL JAY BERGER - GEORGEANN HUNTER NICOL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL JAY BERGER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/04/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF , HON. JOHN H. REID PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS PLACED OFF CALENDAR AND THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED. DISMISSAL FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION WAS FILED ON 12-5-05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. F RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 12/08/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • MEDIATION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WED RE: MEDIATION OF 10/20/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 10/20/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT WE-F NANCI KIRKPATRICK RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SOUTH BAY PROPANE SERVICE INC.) . RECEIPT # SM500645016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MARINA PROPANE SERVICE) . RECEIPT # SM500645015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RAMSOUER, ROBIN S.) . RECEIPT # SM500645014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (SOUTH BAY PROPANE SERVICE INC.) DBA (MARINA PROPANE SERVICE) , (MARINA PROPANE SERVICE) , (RAMSOUER, ROBIN S.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL462301004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/15/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/07/05

    Read MoreRead Less