This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 12:04:49 (UTC).

CREATIVE RECOVERY CONCEPTS, IN VS. CHILDRESS, NAOMI

Case Summary

On 01/24/2005 CREATIVE RECOVERY CONCEPTS, IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHILDRESS, NAOMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0230

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREATIVE RECOVERY CONCEPTS INC.

Defendant

CHILDRESS NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE - FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/22/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 08/23/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 06/29/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 06/29/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2005
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2005
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEF RE: HEARING OF 05/31/05 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2005
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 05/31/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/28/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/28/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/27/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/24/05

    Read MoreRead Less