This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2016 at 10:02:58 (UTC).

COHEN, STEVEN L. VS. R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2004 COHEN, STEVEN L filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1329

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN STEVEN L.

Defendant

R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

STONE, ROSENBLATT & CHA - GREGG S. GARFINKEL

Attorney at STONE, ROSENBLATT & CHA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/30/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • ANSWER FILED BY R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER AND STORAGE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2004
  • ANSWER FILED OF (R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC.) DBA (BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE CO.) . RECEIPT # BH246938013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADDENDUM, STMT OF LOCATION, NOTICE CASE MGMT REVIEW, DRPA, ETC FILED. SERVED AS TO (R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES, INC.) DBA (BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE CO.) . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH246938022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2004
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/10/04

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R & F ROLAPP ENTERPRISES INC. A CORPORATION DBA BEVERLY HILLS TRANSFER & STORAGE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARFINKEL, GREGG S.