This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2016 at 22:32:00 (UTC).

COGHLAN, JANET VS. BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMEN

Case Summary

On 06/20/2005 COGHLAN, JANET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is R. MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3272

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COGHLAN JANET

Defendant

BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 , HON. COMR. MINA D. FRIED PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 , HON. COMR. MINA D. FRIED PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 09/12/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 . STIPULATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2005
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV481002017 . HEARING SET FOR 08/01/05 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRILLIANT DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant