Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 20:25:32 (UTC).

CLARK, ALTA M. VS. CLARK, GARY B.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2002 CLARK, ALTA M filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLARK, GARY B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0331

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLARK ALTA M.

MUNSON LINDA

Defendant

CLARK GARY B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MARK M. O'BRIEN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI439479012 . SHERIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/23/02 . FOR (CLARK, ALTA M.) , (MUNSON, LINDA) . AGAINST (CLARK, GARY B.) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 532 VALMONT DR., MONROVIA, CA 91016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 40.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CLARK, GARY B.) . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CLARK, GARY B.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 003 FOR CONSIDERATION RE: JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF NOTICE AND COPY NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF TENANCY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI019482001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 10/17/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'BRIEN MARK M