This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 04:15:32 (UTC).

CLARA CALDERON VS. GARCIA, SABINA

Case Summary

On 02/17/2005 CLARA CALDERON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA, SABINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0497

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARA CALDERON

Defendants

GARCIA SABINA

LAINEZ VICTORINO

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 23.33 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/14/05 . FOR (CLARA CALDERON) . AGAINST (GARCIA, SABINA) , (LAINEZ, VICTORINO) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3008 1/2 HYDE PARK BL., LOS ANGELES, CA 90043 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED & DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GARCIA, SABINA) , (LAINEZ, VICTORINO) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) ON 03/09/05 . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL488416007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/17/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.