This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2016 at 04:02:03 (UTC).

CITY OF LOS ANGELES VS. JONES, JACQUELINE

Case Summary

On 02/09/2005 CITY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES, JACQUELINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAMELA A. DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0414

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAMELA A. DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendants

JONES STEVEN

JONES MYKEL

JONES GABRIEL

ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

JONES JACQUELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CITY ATTORNEY OFFICE - RICHARD KIM ESQ

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY OFFICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/29/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 09/28/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES . PURSUANT TO TELEPHONE CALL FROM JESSICA WONG IN ROGER YUEN OFFICE, THE PARTIES ARE STILL WORKING OUT AN AGREEMENT. DATE OF 8-24-05 IS ADVANCED AND VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. THE PARTIES ANNOUNCE THEY HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT LODGED WITH THE COURT. . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 08/24/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 07/20/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 07/11/05 AT 08:30A M., IN DIV. WES .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, JACQUELINE) . COSTS OF $ 42.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, MYKEL) . COSTS OF $ 16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, GABRIEL) . COSTS OF $ 16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JONES, STEVEN) . COSTS OF $ 16.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (JONES, JACQUELINE) , (JONES, MYKEL) , (JONES, GABRIEL) , (ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DIV. 003 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2005
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN GC6103.4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2005
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/10/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less