Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 02:40:06 (UTC).

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A. VS. BARRETT, COLE M

Case Summary

On 10/04/2002 CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARRETT, COLE M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0864

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.

Defendant

BARRETT COLE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX - RAYMOND A. PATENAUDE ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO PATENAUDE & FELIX (OUTBOX) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: DOCUMENT ALREADY FILED ON 05/21/03 SUBMITTED ON 05/30/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2003
  • NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO P01 FOR REJECTION OF NOTICE OF HEARING - THE CASE FILE DOESN'T REFLECT A COURT DATE ON MAY 21, 2003. PLEASE SEE THE ATTACHED COPY OF THE MINUTE ORDER SHOWING A HEARING DATE OF JUNE 25, 2003. SUBMITTED ON 05/08/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2003
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY BEN ADELMAN. MOTION MADE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO CONTINUE THE HEARING. MOTION GRANTED . MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/25/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2003
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA N.A.) FOR REJECTION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT - THE HEARING IS CALENDARED FOR APRIL 23, 2003 AT 1:30PM {OUTBOX} SUBMITTED ON 04/07/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2003
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JOSEPH P. SBUTTONI. MOTION MADE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO CONTINUE THE HEARING. MOTION GRANTED . MATTER CONTINUED TO 04/23/03 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . IF DEFENDANT IS SERVED PRIOR TO CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING, PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2002
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/21/03 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/04/02

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citibank South Dakota NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C. - RAYMOND A. PATENAUDE