Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2017 at 11:44:49 (UTC).

CITADEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS SOLDER, CHEO

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 CITADEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SOLDER, CHEO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2137

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT

Defendant

SOLDER CHEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WENDY M HARRIS & ASSOCIATES - WENDY M HARRIS

Attorney at WENDY M HARRIS & ASSOCIATES

HARRIS WENDY M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 01X02137 TO LAM01CB2137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (SOLDER, CHEO) . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 11/10/11 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 12/12/11 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ PROOF. RN BH451225018 . Filing Fee: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT TO (EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2392.06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 01X02137 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 10/28/11 , FOR (EVICTION RECOVERY GROUP) ASSIGNEE OF JUDGMENT , AGAINST (SOLDER, CHEO) , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 2396.00 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 2392.06 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 4,818.06 .

    Read MoreRead Less