This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 20:01:55 (UTC).

C.E.G CONSTRUCTION VS. ABOU, ABID

Case Summary

On 08/09/2002 C E G CONSTRUCTION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABOU, ABID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STANFORD E. REICHERT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6321

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STANFORD E. REICHERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C.E.G CONSTRUCTION

Defendant

ABOU ABID DBA SACO ELECTRIC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. STANFORD E. REICHERT, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC488465021. HEARING SET FOR 09/11/02 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 006.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.E.G. CONSTRUCTION is a litigant