This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2016 at 22:50:20 (UTC).

CASTILLO, LORETO VS. BASSETT, BRITTANY LAUREN

Case Summary

On 08/29/2005 CASTILLO, LORETO filed an Other lawsuit against BASSETT, BRITTANY LAUREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JACQUELINE A. CONNOR, LAWRENCE MIRA and LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0270

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JACQUELINE A. CONNOR

LAWRENCE MIRA

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO LORETO

Defendants

BASSETT DAVID

BASSETT BRITTANY LAUREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L. STARR - ROBERT L. STARR ESQ

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L. STARR

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & OELZE - MARK R. SNYDER

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & OELZE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/07/07 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2006
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (CASTILLO, LORETO) . MATTER TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. A REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED WITHIN 45 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF THE SETTLEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. MATTER CONTINUED TO 03/27/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . THE COURT ORDERS HELEN STORM CSR # 2222 TO TAKE DOWN THE PROCEEDINGS. MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 3/27/06 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DIVISION 1 FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE MIRA PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. (NON APPEARANCE - CASE MANAGMENT REVIEW) MATTER CONTINUED TO 02/27/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK TO NOTIFY THE PARTIES TO APPEAR ON THAT DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/04/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD OF TRANSFER FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER 05V00270 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WEI , HON. JACQUELINE A. CONNOR PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD AND DISCHARGED. COUNSEL REPRESENTS TO THE COURT THAT SERVICE HAS BEEN COMPLETED AND ANSWERS FILED. COURT FINDS AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY IS BELOW JURISDICTIONAL AMOUNT. CASE RECLASSIFIED AS LIMITED; TRANSFERRED TO MALIBU COURTHOUSE. NON APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW SET FOR 1/9/06 AT 8:30AM IN DIV.001 AT THE MALIBU COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 01/09/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BASSETT, BRITTANY LAUREN) . RECEIPT # SM481447026 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2005
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BASSETT, DAVID) . RECEIPT # SM481447013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET & ADDENDUM; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT; NOTICE TO LITIGANTS; BLANK STIP. & ORDER RE BINDING ADITRATION;NOTICE TO COURT MEDIATION PROGRAM;ADR PACKET;BLANK STIP. TO PARTICIPATE IN ADR;DEC. DUE DILIGENCE. SERVED AS TO (BASSETT, BRITTANY LAUREN) BY SERVING (BASSETT, DAVID) CO-OCCUPANT & CO-DEFENDANT. COSTS OF $44.06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2005
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET & ADDENDUM; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT;NOTICE TO LITIGANTS;BLANK SITP. AND ORDER RE BINDING ARDITRATION;NOTICE TO COURT MEDIATION PROGRAM;ADR PACKET;BLANK STIP. TO PARTICIPATE IN ADR; DEC DUE DILIGENCE. SERVED AS TO (BASSETT, DAVID). COSTS OF $59.06 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2005
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND/OR CROSS-COMPLAINT AND FILE PROOF OF SERVICE, AND STATUS CONFERENCE . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/08/05 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • DOCUMENTS ON TRANSFER RECEIVED AND FILED. RN SM485746040.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # SM485746040 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED .

    Read MoreRead Less