This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 03:57:20 (UTC).

CASHEW VENTURES INC. VS. PROMOTION MAN

Case Summary

On 03/29/2002 CASHEW VENTURES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROMOTION MAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BONNIE CHERMAK and TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0100

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BONNIE CHERMAK

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHEW VENTURES INC.

Defendant

PROMOTION MAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2004
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/09/04 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2002
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/16/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PROMOTION MAN) . COSTS OF $ 49.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2002
  • (CASHEW VENTURES INC.) REFUSES TO STIPULATE TO THE JUDGE PRO TEMPORE, CAUSE TRANSFERRED TO DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. BONNIE CHERMAK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/09/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN MAL462393003. HEARING SET FOR 05/03/02 AT 09:30 AM IN DIV. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2002
  • NOTICE OF DELAY REDUCTION POLICY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less