This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 04:02:17 (UTC).

CASH NOW VS. R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 01/10/2001 CASH NOW filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R P C DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASH NOW INC. DOING BUSINESS AS THE BUSINESS LAW CENTER

Defendant

R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT CO INC.

Cross Plaintiff

R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

GORBANOV KARIM INDIVIDUALLY AND DBAGRANITE TOPS ETC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - HAROLD P. MARGULIES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MICHAEL S. TRABISH

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Cross Defendant Attorney

DALE, BRADEN & HINCHCLIFFE, P.C. - R. DALE LANGE

Attorney at DALE, BRADEN & HINCHCLIFFE, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2004
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/05/04 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2003
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2002
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/06/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2002
  • CASE REMOVED FROM MEDIATION HEARING LIST, MATTER REPORTED SETTLED. MEDIATOR INFORMS COURT OF SETTLEMENT BEFORE THE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2002
  • LETTER SENT TO (CASH NOW) INC. DOING BUSINESS AS (THE BUSINESS LAW CENTER) RE: REQUEST FOR MEDIATION STATUS HAVING BEEN REFERRED 02/25/02 WITH A COMPLETION DATE OF 04/25/02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON 01/31/02 . MATTER IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION BY ELECTION OF (CASH NOW) INC. DOING BUSINESS AS (THE BUSINESS LAW CENTER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2002
  • NOTICE OF REGISTRATION TO MEDIATION COORDINATOR FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. CUSTOMIZED FORM ISSUED & TITLED NOTICE/ORDER OF REFERRAL/ORDER TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/06/01 . FOR (CASH NOW) INC. DOING BUSINESS AS (THE BUSINESS LAW CENTER) . AGAINST (R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT) CO, INC. . PRINCIPAL $ 17613.00 . ATTY. FEES $ 660.00 . INTEREST $ 2137.99 . COSTS $ 147.95 . TOTAL $ 20,558.94 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT SIGNED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE EXHIBITS/DEPOSITIONS ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2001
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 3 RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ON OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT) CO, INC. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (R.P.C. DEVELOPMENT) CO, INC. . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOE 1 THROUGH DOE 10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL445385003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less