This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 17:47:12 (UTC).

CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS, G.P. VS. ROSALE, ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2005 CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS, G P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROSALE, ANTHONY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0645

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS G.P.

Defendants

ROSALE RACHELLE DONNELLY

ROSALE ANTHONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - WILLIAM C. ROBISON

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/23/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2005
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW467864003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/22/05 . FOR (CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS, G.P.) . AGAINST (ROSALE, ANTHONY) , (ROSALE, RACHELLE DONNELLY) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 27940 SOLAMINT RD., #9-108, SANTA CLARITA, CA 91387 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 42.20 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2005
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS, G.P.) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT DOCUMENTS - NO SIGNATURE ON CHECKS. SUBMITTED ON 07/21/05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • SUMMONS WITH PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROSALE, ANTHONY) , (ROSALE, RACHELLE DONNELLY) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2005
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ROSALE, ANTHONY) , (ROSALE, RACHELLE DONNELLY) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW500801048.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2005
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 09/02/05 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 004 . OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANYON SIERRA APARTMENTS G.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBISON WILLIAM CHARLES