Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2016 at 08:22:26 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, IN VS. FISCHER, SILVIA L.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2001 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FISCHER, SILVIA L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. DUFFY and RICHARD MEAGLIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0143

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

RICHARD MEAGLIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FISCHER JOHN

FISCHER SILVIA L.

Cross Defendant

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTHPLAN INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS KAISER FO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - EDMOND B. SIEGEL

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN M. ZIMMERMAN - STEVEN M. ZIMMERMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN M. ZIMMERMAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

LAFOLLETTE,JOHNSON,DE HAAS,FESLER, *** - KENT T. BRANDMEYER

Attorney at LAFOLLETTE,JOHNSON,DE HAAS,FESLER, ***

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2003
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (FISCHER, JOHN) (OUTBOX) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ALREADY FILED. SUBMITTED ON 06/13/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) (AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SILVIA L. AND JOHN FISCHER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2002
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/28/02 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR DEFENDANT (FISCHER, JOHN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF EDMOND B. SIEGAL (MAIL) FOR REJECTION OF DISMISSAL: PURSUANT TO MICHAEL J. DUFFY, COMMISSIONER SIGNATURE REQUIRED BY CROSS-COMPLAINANT TO DISMISSAL THE COMPLAINT. SUBMITTED ON 02/19/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2002
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION 003 FOR CONSIDERATION RE: FILING OF DISMISSAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (FISCHER, SILVIA L.) FOR REJECTION OF SUB. OF ATTY. - THE NAME ON LINE 6 SHOULD BE CONSISTANT WITH THE NAME ON LINE 2A. SUBMITTED ON 02/07/02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO LAW OFFICES OF EDMOND B. SIEGEL FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL: COMPLAINT MAY NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT DISPOSITION OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT. SUBMITTED ON 01/28/02

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. PER TELEPHONE CALL FROM PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REQUEST TO CONTINUE. REQUEST GRANTED. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/31/01 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2001
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED. {BY PLAINTIFF}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT; CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.) SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • ANSWER FILED OF (FISCHER, SILVIA L.) , (FISCHER, JOHN) . RECEIPT # SNI258286005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (FISCHER, SILVIA L.) , (FISCHER, JOHN) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.) SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA . RECEIPT # SNI258286008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2001
  • SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 06/01/01 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI258286002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERMAN STEVEN M.