Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 13:56:43 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, IN VS. ESCALANTE, MARIA T.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2002 CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESCALANTE, MARIA T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0394

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ESCALANTE MARIA T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE - FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J. LOVE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 3827.29 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 85.00 FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 12C02034 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO A RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED ON THIS CASE AND ALL PAPERS HAVING BEEN PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER, THEREFORE, THE OLD CASE JACKET WAS DESTROYED ON 08/07/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AFTER 180 DAYS FROM ORANGE COUNTY AS FOLLOWS: UNSATISFIED WITH UNCOLLECTED COSTS OF: $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 85.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, INC.) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION , RECEIPT NO. ALH486807008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 2587.15 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2007
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. , RECEIPT NO. ALH258280012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;CLERK'S NOTICE AND NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE & ORDER TO APPEAR FILED. SERVED AS TO (ESCALANTE, MARIA T.) . COSTS OF $ 27.50 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOE I, DOE II, DOE III, ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ESCALANTE, MARIA T.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: WAIVER OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: UNDERLYING ACTION OF OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2002
  • ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2002
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 08/07/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE, FRANKLIN J