This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2016 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

CAIRE, CLAUDETTE VS CORNEJO, JOSE LUIS

Case Summary

On 12/10/2004 CAIRE, CLAUDETTE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CORNEJO, JOSE LUIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6376

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAIRE CLAUDETTE

Defendants

CORNEJO JOSE LUIS

BECK BARBARA J

HERNANDEZ CART SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW L ELLIS & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

EARLY MASLACH & RUDNICKI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2007
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2005
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL REJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2005
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT FILED BY:LEAH CATHERINE LAUNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2005
  • NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING FILED 01-24-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2004
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/05, IN DIV/DEPT 8B * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • COMPLAINT FILED - TRANSFER CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • CASE BC317228 ORIGINALLY FILED IN LASC/UNLIMITED 06-17-04 AND NOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2004
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2004
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDEZ CART SERVICE INC. is a litigant