This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2016 at 16:10:45 (UTC).

BUSTOS, JUAN ANTONIO VS WALT'S TOW SERVICE

Case Summary

On 01/08/2001 BUSTOS, JUAN ANTONIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALT'S TOW SERVICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLEN J. WEBSTER, JR and DANIEL SCHUCH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0047

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLEN J. WEBSTER, JR

DANIEL SCHUCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSTOS JUAN ANTONIO

Defendant

WALT'S TOW SERVICE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM01S00047 TO DOW01SC0047

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A , HON. DANIEL SCHUCH, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/19/01 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO WALTS TOW SERVICE-TO THE OFFICE PERSON . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2001
  • NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (BUSTOS, JUAN ANTONIO) DUE TO UNKNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2001
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A . SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A , HON. ALLEN J. WEBSTER, JR. COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS TRIAL OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR HEARING FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/28/01 , AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 00A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN PAID. HEARING SET FOR 02/21/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 00A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2001
  • NOTICE OF DELAY REDUCTION POLICY FILED. SC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT'S TOW SERVICE is a litigant