This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2016 at 04:15:40 (UTC).

BUEZO, NOLVIA VS. STEVENSON, CLINTON

Case Summary

On 06/07/2002 BUEZO, NOLVIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEVENSON, CLINTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD SILVER and TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0127

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD SILVER

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUEZO NOLVIA

Defendant

STEVENSON CLINTON III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSS & ZALUD, L.L.P. - TAMARA M CROSS

Attorney at CROSS & ZALUD, L.L.P.

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CATHY ANDERSON - CHARLES P. WESSLER ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CATHY ANDERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2006
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2006
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/05/06 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BUEZO, NOLVIA) FOR REJECTION OF DECLARATION AND ORDER RE ADVANCE JURY FEES MAY BE SUBMITTED WHEN THE DISMISSAL IS FILED WITH THE COURT. SUBMITTED ON 10/08/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2003
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (STEVENSON, CLINTON) III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2003
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 11/05/03 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. NO SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUED FOR JURY TRIAL TO 11/03/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2003
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR JURY TRIAL. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JOY EDEN . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY ROBERT H. EDGARTON .

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2003
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. TERRY ADAMSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR STATUS CONFERENCE. THE COURT REFERS THE MATTER TO MEDIATION. NOTICE IS WAIVED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 05/12/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2003
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2003
  • STATUS CONFERENCE QUESTIONNAIRE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2002
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2002
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/03/03 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2002
  • ANSWER FILED OF (STEVENSON, CLINTON) III . RECEIPT # MAL459448032 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2002
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (STEVENSON, CLINTON) III .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less