This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 at 17:16:28 (UTC).

Bollar, Carol J. Vs. Mazal, Elie

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Bollar Carol J against Mazal Elie in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0487

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Ross Amspoker, Referee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bollar Carol J.

Defendant

Mazal Elie Ind. & Dba Mazal Chevron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/14/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2001
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED. '

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 , HON. PAUL LIBIS, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/18/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 , HON. PAUL LIBIS, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION FOR PLAINTIFF, CAROL BOLLAR AGAINST DEFENDANT, ELIE MAZAL INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MAZAL CHEVRON IN THE PRINCIPAL SUM OF $250.00 PLUS COSTS OF $50.00 FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $300.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/18/01 . FOR (BOLLAR, CAROL J.) . AGAINST (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) . PRINCIPAL $ 250.00 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 300.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/18/01 AT 08:20A M, IN DIV. A13 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 , HON. ROSS AMSPOKER, REFEREE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION FOR PLAINTIFF, CAROL J. BOLLAR AGAINST DEFENDANT, ELIE MAZAL INDIVIDUALLY DBA MAZAL CHEVRON IN THE PRINCIPAL SUM OF $912.55 PLUS COSTS OF $50.00 FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $962.55.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/19/01 . FOR (BOLLAR, CAROL J.) . AGAINST (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) . PRINCIPAL $ 912.55 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 962.55 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MAZAL, ELIE) IND. & DBA (MAZAL CHEVRON) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/19/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. A13 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN PAID. HEARING SET FOR 04/19/01 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. A13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.