This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2016 at 04:12:09 (UTC).

Benavides, Maria Teresa Vs. Magana, Jose

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Benavides Maria Teresa against Magana Jose in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0188

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benavides Maria Teresa

Defendant

Magana Jose

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2001
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2001
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2001
  • NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO ARBITRATION MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2001
  • SC SET 01/28/02, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 88C, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2001
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 5 DAY(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2001
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2001
  • SC SET 09/10/01, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 88C, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED - MOTOR VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.