Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2016 at 10:42:51 (UTC).

BECERRA, GENEVEVO VS. GHANEM, DALIA FARID

Case Summary

On 12/24/2002 BECERRA, GENEVEVO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GHANEM, DALIA FARID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ERIC LUTHI and MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1241

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ERIC LUTHI

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BECERRA GENEVEVO

Defendant

GHANEM DALIA FARID

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2003
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2003
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO UNKNOWN . COSTS OF $ 00.00 . POSSIBLE FAULTY SERVICE-PARTY SERVED, DELIVERY DATE, TIME, AND ADDRESS UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. ERIC LUTHI, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/15/03 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/10/03 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . PLAINTIFF'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET THE HEARING IS GRANTED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2003
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 03/06/03 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 003 . PLAINTIFF TO EFFECT SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SNI478057. HEARING SET FOR 01/30/03 AT 10:30 AM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less