Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2016 at 17:47:31 (UTC).

BANK ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. ESQUIVEL, SAMARA

Case Summary

On 02/25/2000 BANK ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESQUIVEL, SAMARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0155

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK ONE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FKA FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO AS TR

Defendants

PEREZ EDWARD P

ESQUIVEL SAMARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLF & RICHARDS, A LAW CORPORATION - DONNA L. LA PORTE

Attorney at WOLF & RICHARDS, A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2002
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2000
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO DONNA LA PORTE FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION, CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON MARCH 30, 2000, DOCUMENTS RETURNED VIA MAIL, CHECK #.S 3864 AND 3863 RETURNED. SUBMITTED ON 05/12/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2000
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO DONNA LA PORTE FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT, JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION, PER TELEPHONE CONVERSATION WITH ATTORNEY DONNA LA PORTE ON APRIL 18, 2000, TO RETURNED DEFAULT PACKAGE AND ENTER FAX DISMISSAL, CHECK #'S 3863 AND 3864 RETURNED. SUBMITTED ON 03/22/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. DAVID SOTELO, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: (PEREZ, EDWARD, P) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PEREZ, EDWARD, P) . RN PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S). RML(NO COPY TO CONFORM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2000
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BANK ONE, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) FKA (FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF CHICAGO,) AS TRUSTEE FOR REJECTION OF I HAVE ENTERED DEFAULT AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS ONLY, HOWEVER, A DISPOSITION AS TO SAMARA ESQUIVEL IS GOING TO BE REQUIRED. AND PLEASE INCLUDE ORIGINAL SUMMONS. MATTER SET FOR HEARING MARCH 30, 2000 AT 10:00 A.M. IN DIV. 3. THANK YOU, SUBMITTED ON 03/09/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2000
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY EDWARD P. PEREZ . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 03/30/00 AT 10:00A M IN DIV. 003 . RN 135959023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2000
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ALL OCCUPANTS ONLY. . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2000
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY CLAIMANT (PEREZ, EDWARD P.) . . RN 135959001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2000
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 235366020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2000
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANK ONE-PLATINUM ETAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LA PORTE, DONNA