This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 10:26:44 (UTC).

BALDWIN, SYTUN VS. EASLEY, JERRY

Case Summary

On 10/30/2001 BALDWIN, SYTUN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EASLEY, JERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS KEISER and MICHAEL J. DUFFY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0892

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS KEISER

MICHAEL J. DUFFY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALDWIN SYTUN

Defendant

EASLEY JERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2003
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. MICHAEL J. DUFFY, TEMPORARY JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL . MOTION DENIED. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2002
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL , DECLARATION FILED BY (BALDWIN, SYTUN) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/04/02 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (BALDWIN, SYTUN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • DocketORDER GRANTING APPLICATION{S} FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (BALDWIN, SYTUN) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT{S} PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FILING FEES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2002
  • DocketNOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2001
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2001
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2001
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 , HON. THOMAS KEISER, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2001
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE , PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM PREVIOUSLY ADJUDICATED IN CASE 01S00694, RES JUDICATA. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE. . .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2001
  • DocketEXHIBITS, IF ANY, WILL BE DESTROYED AT THE END OF 60 DAYS FROM EXPIRATION OF APPEAL TIME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2001
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO MONROVIA POLICE DEPARTMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2001
  • DocketRECORDS RECEIVED PURSUANT TO SUBPENA DUCES TECUM AND PLACED IN CASE FILE. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2001
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (EASLEY, JERRY) BY SUB-SERVING TOBY FLEMING ASST. MGR . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/03/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 003 COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2001
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN WAIVER/CRC. HEARING SET FOR 12/03/01 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2001
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2001
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (BALDWIN, SYTUN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2001
  • DocketORDER GRANTING APPLICATION{S} FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (BALDWIN, SYTUN) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT{S} PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FIRST APPEARANCE/FILING FEES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2001
  • DocketNOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less