This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:25:30 (UTC).

BAKER, ROBERT E. VS. KARIM,IRAJ C.

Case Summary

On 01/17/2012 BAKER, ROBERT E filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KARIM,IRAJ C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2473

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMPBELL BARBARA AS CO-TRUSTEE OF CAMPBELL TRUST

BAKER ROBERT E. AS CO-TRUSTEE OF BAKER TRUST

Defendant

KARIM IRAJ C. DBA EXCELLENCY ANTIQUES AND FINE FURNITURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, FIDLER & CHAPLAN, LLC - GARY D. FIDLER ESQ

Attorney at GREENE, FIDLER & CHAPLAN, LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (KARIM,IRAJ C.) DBA EXCELLENCY ANTIQUES AND FINE FURNITURE . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 02/24/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 03/26/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 03C02473 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 31778.41 . RECEIPT # 490068064 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 03C02473 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 11700.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 66.30 FILED BY (BAKER, ROBERT E.) AS CO-TRUSTEE OF (BAKER TRUST) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON THE APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AS A FINAL DISPOSTION ON 01/17/12 , FOR (BAKER, ROBERT E.) AS CO-TRUSTEE OF (BAKER TRUST) , AGAINST (KARIM,IRAJ C.) DBA EXCELLENCY ANTIQUES AND FINE FURNITURE , PRINCIPAL (LINE E) $ 20048.41 , INTEREST AFTER JUDGMENT (LINE F) $ 11700.00 , FEE FOR FILING RENEWAL (LINE G) $ 30.00 . TOTAL $ 31,778.41 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED ON 01/17/12 W/SAME CASE #03C02473 JUDGMENT RENEWED,,,OLD JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/17/2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT STAYED UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BAKER, ROBERT E.) AS CO-TRUSTEE OF (BAKER TRUST) FOR REJECTION OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (1)YOUR CASE 03C02473, DATE, MUST FILE AN COSTS AND INTEREST , IF YOU HAVE CREDITS YOU MUST SHOW PLEASE MAKE ALL CORRECTIONS AND RE-SUBMIT MAKE ATTN: LINDA SUBMITTED ON 07/13/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED CT DATE 05-30-07 . RECEIPT # BH505817007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2007
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED CT DATE 05-30-07 . RECEIPT # BH505817007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2003
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (KARIM,ARAJ C.) DBA EXCELLENCY ANTIQUES AND FINE FURNITURE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM O 31748.61. RN 278865002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER CASE NUMBER 96C01664 ARE PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE UNDER THIS NUMBER. JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/17/03 . FOR (BAKER, ROBERT E.) AS CO-TRUSTEE OF (BAKER TRUST) , (CAMPBELL,BARBARA) AS CO-TRUSTEE OF (CAMPBELL TRUST) . AGAINST (KARIM,ARAJ C.) DBA EXCELLENCY ANTIQUES AND FINE FURNITURE . PRINCIPAL $ 20012.11 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 11700.00 . COSTS $ 36.30 . TOTAL $ 31,748.41 . RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT OLD CASE# 96C01664,JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/09/97, NEW CASE #03C02473 RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/17/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2003
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less