This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2016 at 17:48:23 (UTC).

B D K U.S.A. INC. VS. CENTRAL ESCROW, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2002 B D K U S A INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CENTRAL ESCROW, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARY BOUNDS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9206

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARY BOUNDS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B D K U.S.A. INC.

Defendant

CENTRAL ESCROW INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2002
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • PARTY REPRESENTATIVE DECLARATION FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 , HON. GARY BOUNDS,COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/20/02 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2002
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (CENTRAL ESCROW, INC.) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 11/20/02 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 005 . RECEIPT # LAC261046019 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2002
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (CENTRAL ESCROW, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT IS REJECTED. THIS MUST BE FILED BY A REPRESENTATIVE FROM THE COMPANY. THE DEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY CANNOT FILE THIS REQUEST. ALSO WHEN REQUEST IS FILED, WE REQUIRE A REASON FOR THE REQUEST AND A SIGNATURE. SUBMITTED ON 10/10/02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUBPENA DUCES TECUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CENTRAL ESCROW, INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC488465003. HEARING SET FOR 10/25/02 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 005.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BDK USA INC> is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL ESCROW INC. is a litigant