Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 12:35:50 (UTC).

AURA MANAGMENT GROUP, VS. BROWN,MARKARAL

Case Summary

On 07/29/2004 AURA MANAGMENT GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROWN,MARKARAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2236

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Culver City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AURA MANAGMENT GROUP INC.

Defendant

BROWN MARKARAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - SHERYL MANDELBAUM ESQ

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2004
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 1700.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2004
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # CUL485132004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BROWN,MARKARAL) AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/24/04 , FOR (AURA MANAGMENT GROUP,)INC. , AGAINST (BROWN,MARKARAL) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 5424 93RD STREET 1, LOS ANGELES, CA 90045 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 35.83 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2004
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AURA MANAGMENT GROUP,)INC. FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. FAULTY SERVICE, MUST BE SERVED AS SUED. SUBMITTED ON 09/20/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT R FILED. REQUEST DENIED, FAULTY SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 10/14/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2004
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 481447001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2004
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2004
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2004
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO APPEAR FILED AND MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/30/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANDELBAUM, SHERYL