This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2016 at 07:10:01 (UTC).

Atlantic Financial Ez Check Ad Vs. Saucedo, Michelle

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Atlantic Financial Ez Check Ad against Saucedo Michelle in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0597

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Atlantic Financial Ez Check Advance

Defendant

Saucedo Michelle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2005
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/21/04 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2001
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2001
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/05/01 AT 08:15A M, IN DIV. NEM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 011. HEARING SET FOR 04/23/01 AT 08:15 AM IN DIV. NEM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.