This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2016 at 06:10:10 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC VS. SEGURA, ROSA E.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2003 ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEGURA, ROSA E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Culver City Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOE W. HILBERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2199

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOE W. HILBERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

SEGURA ROSA E. AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC - HARVEY M. MOORE ESQ

Attorney at THE MOORE LAW GROUP, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2005
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/23/05 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 03/03/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2004
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2004
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO COMM. RALPH AMADO RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2004
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 02/18/04 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2004
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2003
  • DEFAULT PACKAGE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTY. FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT YOUR DEFAULT PACKAGE WAS RECEIVED AND PROCESSED. HOWEVER, YOUR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK WAS NOT ENTERED. THIS COMPLAINT IS REGARDING A CREDIT CARD MONEY. THEREFORE, THE CLERK CANNOT ENTER JUDGMENT. SUBMITTED ON 11/14/03

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2003
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTY. FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT PACKAGE IS BEING RETURNED. DEFAULT WAS NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED DUE TO ITEM #6 ON THE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT NOT COMPLETED. PLEASE FILE A NEW REQUEST SUBMITTED ON 10/03/03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2003
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED. DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED. (DECLARATION OF MAILING REQUIRES DATE OF EXECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • SUMMONS FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE THEREON AS TO (SEGURA, ROSA E.) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2003
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. JOE W. HILBERMAN, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: OSC RE COMPLIANCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT SETS THE FOLLOWING HEARING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 09/16/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2003
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN CUL481447006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2003
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2003
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 08/04/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2003
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/03/03

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE, HARVEY M