This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 21:25:12 (UTC).

AOF/PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING VS PERALTA, EDWARD

Case Summary

On 06/14/2002 AOF/PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PERALTA, EDWARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0973

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AOF/PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING

Defendants

RAMIREZ ELIZABETH

PERALTA EDWARD

RAMIREZ BLONCA

RAMIREZ CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIERSTADT, EDWARD T

Defendant Attorney

CASTILLO, BLANCA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2012
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2002
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2002
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2002
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2002
  • EXHIBITS RECEIVED, LOGGED AND STORED AT CCH, ROOM 325A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2002
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 07/30/02, 09:00 AM, DIV/DEPT 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2002
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2002
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2002
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2002
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2002
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2002
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2002
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2002
  • OSC SET 07/26/02, 0830 AM, DIV/DEPT 8B, RM 426, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2002
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2002
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AOF PACIFIC AFFORDABLE HOUSING CORPORATION is a litigant