This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2017 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

ANNEX FINANCIAL,INC., VS. LERNER, ELAINE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2012 ANNEX FINANCIAL,INC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LERNER, ELAINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HUGH M. BOBYS and LISA HART COLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0859

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HUGH M. BOBYS

LISA HART COLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNEX FINANCIAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION A

Defendant

LERNER ELAINE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'ROURKE, FONG & MANOUKIAN, LLP - RODERICK D. FONG ESQ

Attorney at O'ROURKE, FONG & MANOUKIAN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2012
  • RECEIVED FROM (ANNEX FINANCIAL,INC.,) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED 01/09/12) THE SUM OF $ 90.00 FOR REPLACEMENT OF RETURNED NSF CHECK, SUM INCLUDES A $65.00 ADMINISTRATIVE CHARGE. RECEIPT # BH278865027 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • `NSF` CHECK RECEIVED FOR WRIT . A-UNITED NOTIFIED BY BOOKKEEPER NOTIFIED PER SECTION C.C.P. 411.20. CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED FILED AND MAILED. PAYMENT IS DUE BY 10/30/12 . THE AMOUNT DUE IS $ 90.00 . . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (ANNEX FINANCIAL,INC.,) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED 01/09/12) , RECEIPT NO. BH535206008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 3139.89 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 60.00 FILED BY (ANNEX FINANCIAL,INC.,) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (ASSIGNEE OF RECORD FILED 01/09/12) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # BH535206010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (LERNER, ELAINE) AN INDIVIDUAL . DATE OF SERVICE WAS ON 01/26/12 . NO ENFORCEABLE EXECUTION TO ISSUE PRIOR TO 02/27/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND NEW CASE FILE OPENED. ALL PAPERS PREVIOUSLY FILED UNDER THIS CASE NUMBER ARE PLACED INTO THE NEW ASSIGNED CASE NUMBER 01C00859 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR AND RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED. TOTAL JUDGMENT RENEWED IN THE SUM OF $ 46025.91 . RECEIPT # 53524015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY PLAINTIFF (PREFERRED RESTORATION, INC.) BAR NUMBER AND ATTORNEY NAME: 170632-56 WENDY M HARRIS ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: OF GIL SALAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2002
  • DECLARATION RE: OF RODERICK D. FONG IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2002
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 100 ONLY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2001
  • NOTICE OF CLERK'S NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RETURNED AS TO RODERICK D. FONG ESQ DUE TO UNDELIVERABLE ADDRESS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2001
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/18/02 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. WBH . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2001
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LERNER, ELAINE) AN INDIVIDUAL . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LERNER, ELAINE) AN INDIVIDUAL BY SERVING ON BOGDAN POPESCU, BUILDING MANAGER . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2001
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH474378007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2001
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2001
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 10/29/01 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less