Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 06:42:27 (UTC).

ALLETTO, JOSEPH VS. DAVIS, SHARON

Case Summary

On 02/06/2002 ALLETTO, JOSEPH filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, SHARON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Monrovia Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0053

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Monrovia Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLETTO JOSEPH

Defendants

GUTHRIE MELINDA

GUTHRIE KENNETH

DAVIS SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - WAYNE M. ABB

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2004
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 105.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • SUMMONS AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DAVIS, SHARON) , (GUTHRIE, KENNETH) , (GUTHRIE, MELINDA) , ALL UNNAMED TENANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 00.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/13/02 . FOR (ALLETTO, JOSEPH) . AGAINST (DAVIS, SHARON) , (GUTHRIE, KENNETH) , (GUTHRIE, MELINDA) , ALL UNNAMED TENANTS . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 227 EL DORADO, ARCADIA, CA 91006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 11.67 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2002
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SNI019482002 . (MAIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING RETURNED AS TO DAVIS, SHARON DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SNI439479007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2002
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/20/02 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. KLM .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABB WAYNE M. ESQ.