This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2016 at 01:07:50 (UTC).

ALL SYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTION, I VS. RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRI

Case Summary

On 03/24/2004 ALL SYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTION, I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2291

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL SYSTEMS FIRE PROTECTION INC.

Defendant

RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT FUND INC. C/

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2005
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2004
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 114 , HON. MINA D. FRIED, COMR. PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2004
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RIBET ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL ENRICHMENT FUND, INC.) C/O RONALD . SIRES (REGISTERED AGENT) BY SUB-SERVING REGINA MARCOS . COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2004
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAV468280017. HEARING SET FOR 05/18/04 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 114.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where All Systems Fire Protection Company, Inc. is a litigant